Name | Tenure | |
---|---|---|
Dr. A.J Kidwal |
24/06/1972 to 21/03/1973 | |
Dr. A Ramachandran |
01/04/1973 to 08/10/1978 | |
Prof. M.G.K Menon |
09/10/1978 to 30/04/1982 | |
Dr. S. Vardarajan |
01/05/1982 to 18/09/1984 | |
Prof. Yashpal |
18/09/1984 to 04/03/1986 | |
Dr. S. Ramachandran |
13/03/1986 to 01/07/1986 | |
Dr. V.R Gowarikar |
02/07/1986 to 24/04/1991 | |
Dr. P. Ramarao |
24/04/1991 to 30/06/1995 | |
Prof. V.S Ramamurthy |
30/06/1995 to 30/04/2006 | |
Dr. T. Ramasami |
25/04/2006 to 30/04/2014 | |
Prof. K. Vijay Raghavan |
01/05/2014 to 08/01/2015 | |
Prof. Ashutosh Sharma |
09/01/2015 to 31/08/2021 | |
Dr. Renu Swarup |
01/09/2021 to 31/10/2021 | |
Dr. M. Ravichandran |
01/11/2021 to 13/12/2021 |